MA S2518 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the treasurer of the town of Middleborough to pay from available funds to Middleborough High School students, parents or guardians amounts paid but not reimbursed for the costs of the 2020 senior trip. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the treasurer of the town of Middleborough to pay from available funds to Middleborough High School students, parents or guardians amounts paid but not reimbursed for the costs of the 2020 senior trip
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-09-19 | House | Enacted |
2022-09-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-05-09 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-07 | House | House concurred |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
H3065 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2199 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
H4945 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Read for information and returned
H3476 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1353 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2022
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2544 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
H4199 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4370
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
H3065 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2199 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
H4945 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Read for information and returned
H3476 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1353 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2022
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2544 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
H4199 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4370
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2518 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2518.pdf |