MA S1375 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public health dental hygienists. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the sustainability of public health dental hygienists through adequate reimbursements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Accompanied H2319 |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2319 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S767 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H4792 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S767 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H4792 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1375 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1375.pdf |