MA H3544 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3535

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the cultivation of cannabis and industrial hemp on land with agricultural preservation restrictions. Cannabis Policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying agricultural preservation restrictions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseAccompanied H3535
2019-04-26JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
2019-04-26JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2019-04-26JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy

Same As/Similar To

H3545 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3651 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3535 (Replaced by) 2019-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback