MA H3545 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4526
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a cannabis and hemp cultivation research center at the University of Massachusetts, Amherst. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Establishing a cannabis and hemp cultivation research center at the University of Massachusetts, Amherst
Sponsors
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
Rep. David Vieira [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4526 |
2019-12-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S767 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H1210 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S1563 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3544 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
S1564 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1222 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H2269 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S1514
S1815 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4526 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1210 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S1563 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3544 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
S1564 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1222 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H2269 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S1514
S1815 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4526 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3545 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3545.pdf |