MA H3483 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4723

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the education of children with certain disabilities and life-threatening impairments. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to medically fragile students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4723
2017-07-05JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H3926 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
S2173 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H40 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H12 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H19 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2112 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Senate concurred
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2330 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4723 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback