MA H3926 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish early literacy education grant programs within the departments of Elementary and Secondary Education and Early Education and Care. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to early literacy education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25SenateSenate concurred
2017-09-21HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education
2017-08-31HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S317 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H324 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S278 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H3556 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2173 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - House concurred
H289 (Similar To) 2017-08-31 - Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 & A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback