MA H4707 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3926
Note: Replaces legislation H3984
Note: Replaces legislation H3984
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the committee on Education to make an investigation and study of certain House documents concerning education
Title
Education
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-09 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2018-07-09 | House | Accompanied by H3926 and H3984 |
2018-07-09 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3926 (Replaces) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
H3984 (Replaces) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5029 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Text of an amendment, see S2330
H3984 (Replaces) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5029 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Text of an amendment, see S2330
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4707 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4707.pdf |