MA H329 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit businesses from misrepresenting the geographic location of such businesses in local telephone directories. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Prohibiting intentional misrepresentation by a business of its location
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H195 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H367 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied S213
H221 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1048 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H928 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S599 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S221 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H367 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied S213
H221 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1048 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H928 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S599 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S221 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H329 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H329.pdf |