MA S687 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Hearing: May 28 @ 10:30 am in A-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide immediate relief to businesses on health care costs. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide immediate relief to businesses on health care costs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H329 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S599 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S221 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H195 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S559 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1673 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S543 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H221 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3549 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H183 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S2223 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback