MA H928 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize business to business commercial insurance transactions. Financial Services.
Title
Relating to modernizing business to business commercial insurance transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H195 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1048 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1798 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S599 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H195 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1048 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1798 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S599 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H928 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H928.pdf |