CA SB366 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10004.6 of, to repeal Sections 10004.5, 10005, and 10013 of, and to repeal and add Section 10004 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
The California Water Plan: long-term supply targets.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Bill Essayli [R] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] |
Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB366 Caballero et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-11 | Assembly | July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1400.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1167.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 899.) (April 25). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10004 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10004.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10004.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10013 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |