MA H2642 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting small business competitiveness by reducing the tax on certain sales totaling one thousand dollars or greater. Revenue.
Title
Relative to promoting small business competitiveness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2505 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1048 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1151 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1410 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1295 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
H771 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3945
H2758 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1776 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1048 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1151 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1410 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1295 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
H771 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3945
H2758 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1776 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2642 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2642.pdf |