MA H771 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3945

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3945
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reduce plastic bag pollution by requiring the availability of reusable bags at certain stores. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing plastic bag pollution

Sponsors

Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]
Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3945
2019-03-26JointHearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H1958 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H751 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
S490 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
S1207 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S453 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S458 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1834 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
H3945 (Replaced by) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback