MA S490 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3976
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote awareness of sewage pollution in public waters. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Promoting awareness of sewage pollution in public waters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3976 |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1918 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H723 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H874 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S645 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1207 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H771 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3945
H751 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
H1958 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3976 (Replaced by) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4921
H723 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H874 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S645 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1207 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H771 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3945
H751 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
H1958 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3976 (Replaced by) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4921
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S490 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S490.pdf |