MA S1834 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish plastic pollution action day in the commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing plastic pollution action day in the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1341 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S951 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1839 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S951 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1839 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1834 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1834.pdf |