MA S221 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Economic Development and Emerging Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to invest in Massachusetts citizens. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To invest in Massachusetts citizens

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H184 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1311 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S2025 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H451 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H2951 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback