MA H324 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Orleans be exempt from certain provisions of the state plumbing code at all municipal seasonal beach facilities in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Orleans to exempt all municipal seasonal beach facilities from the applicable provisions of the state plumbing code
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H893 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
H1675 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S440 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1675 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S440 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H324 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H324.pdf |