MA H1675 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Peake of Provincetown, a petition of Sarah K. Peake, Julian Cyr and Stephan Hay (by vote of the town) that the restoration of the Old Firehouse in the town of Orleans be exempt from certain provisions of the prevailing wage laws. Labor and Workforce Development. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the development of certain land in the town of Orleans
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5123 |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1633 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1668 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H324 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1047 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1668 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H324 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1047 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1675 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1675.pdf |