MA H3141 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to license plate readers. Transportation.
Title
Relative to license plate readers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-02-18 | House | Accompanied by H3036 |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3131 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3017 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3100 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3183 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3036 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied H3141
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3131 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3017 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3100 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3183 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3036 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied H3141
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3141 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3141.pdf |