MA H3036 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3141

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied H3141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to license plate tracking. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate license plate tracking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseAccompanied H3141
2019-12-23JointHearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3398 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1032 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H987 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3100 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2979 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S1375 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H3141 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback