CA AB3265 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21168.6.6 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: environmental leadership media campus projects: judicial streamlining.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.6.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |