MA S2333 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow for a Legion of Merit license plate. Transportation.
Title
Allowing for a Legion of Merit license plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2560 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2560 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-09-09 | House | House concurred |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2143 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3096 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2143 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3096 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2333 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2333.pdf |