MA H3100 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of 26th Infantry Division or 26th Infantry Brigade motor vehicle registration plates. Transportation.
Title
Relative to military license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4772 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H194 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3237 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2168 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H1235 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2241 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
H3237 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2168 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H1235 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2241 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3100 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3100.pdf |