MA H3017 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to low digit number plates on leased vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to low digit number plates on leased vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3128 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3141 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3128 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3141 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3017 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3017.pdf |