MA H3075 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the Department of Transportation to provide notices to landowners prior to performing work on abutting land. Transportation.
Title
Requiring MassDOT to provide notice and mitigation if MassDOT removes trees
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4438 |
2016-02-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/10/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4438 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H3043
H2394 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2045 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H2808 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1562 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3074 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H2394 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2045 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H2808 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1562 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3074 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3075 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3075.pdf |