MA H2891 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to freezing of the rate and valuation of taxes on real income to protect elder housing. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect elder housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-17HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2022-04-07HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-12-14JointHearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
H3891 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2470 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S2471 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4059 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
H2986 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S883 (Similar To) 2021-09-01 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S884 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S905 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2013 (Similar To) 2021-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
S895 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S402 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S36 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S878 (Similar To) 2021-09-01 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S879 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S882 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback