MA S2471 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the appointment of guardians ad litem in the housing court. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the appointment of guardians ad litem in the housing court
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-09 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H1646 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
H1829 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S127 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
H1829 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S127 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2471 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2471.pdf |