MA H2986 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize cities and towns to impose a local affordable housing surcharge on certain real property. Revenue.
Title
Authorizing a local affordable housing surcharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5247 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1985 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S867 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S888 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1985 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S867 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S888 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2986 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2986.pdf |