MA S888 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote affordable housing. Housing.
Title
Promoting access to affordable housing in the 21st century
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S43 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - New draft (Gobi) substituted, see S2610
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1920 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1507 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1004 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1891 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S592 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S1805 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2987
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1510 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2270
S2610 (Similar To) 2022-01-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2022
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1920 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1507 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1004 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1891 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S592 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S1805 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2987
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1510 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2270
S2610 (Similar To) 2022-01-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2022
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S888.pdf |