MA H2771 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require that motor vehicles owned and operated by the Commonwealth only be replaced with zero-emission vehicles. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
For the Commonwealth to procure zero-emission vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] |
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Rep. Russell Holmes [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2119 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3270 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
S2113 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2119 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3270 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
S2113 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2771 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2771.pdf |