MA H4050 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to motor vehicle rental transactions. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the General Laws in relation to enacting the Vehicle Rental Modernization Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-18HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
2020-01-21JointHearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-08-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2019-04-25HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4044 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
H3440 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2427 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
H642 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback