CA SB708 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-04 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-04 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 38087.7 and 38231.7 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: off-highway motor vehicles: off-highway motorcycles: sanctioned event permit.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent SB708 Jones (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-22 - Assembly - SB 708 Jones Senate Third Reading By Garcia (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB708 Jones (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-22 - Assembly - SB 708 Jones Senate Third Reading By Garcia (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB708 Jones (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-04 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 6445.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7). |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | June 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and TRANS. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1054.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 904.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 547.) (March 28). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and TRANS. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 38087.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 38231.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |