MA H2378 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1542
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Parkinson's disease disability and death of certain firefighters and other public safety officers in the contributory retirement plan for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Parkinson's disease disability and death in firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-30 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-12-30 | House | Accompanied by S1542 and S1546 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1542 (Replaces) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1542 (Replaces) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2378 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2378.pdf |