MA H2104 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3977
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3977
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3977
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a palliative care and quality of life interdisciplinary advisory council. Public Health.
Title
To improve quality of life by expanding access to palliative care
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Frank Smizik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3977 |
2013-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3977 (Replaced by) 2014-11-03 - New draft substituted, see H4520
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2104 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2104.pdf |