MA H3977 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2104
Note: Legislation replaced by H4520
Note: Legislation replaced by H4520
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-03 - New draft substituted, see H4520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-03 - New draft substituted, see H4520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve quality of life by expanding access to palliative care
Title
To improve quality of life by expanding access to palliative care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-03 | House | New draft substituted, see H4520 |
2014-11-03 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-11-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2014-11-03 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-11-03 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4520 |
2014-06-25 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2014-03-25 | House | New draft of H2104 |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2104 (Replaces) 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3977
H4520 (Replaced by) 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 478 of the Acts of 2014
H4520 (Replaced by) 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 478 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3977 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3977.pdf |