MA H1822 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to impose penalties for cruel conditions for animals. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing the issuance of citations for cruel conditions for animals

Sponsors

Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]
Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Sen. John Velis [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 8, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-27SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-26HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 23, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 2, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-28JointHearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H1555 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3478 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3917 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback