MA H1793 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creating a pilot program to transfer high acuity behavioral health and dual diagnosis patients away from overcrowded emergency departments. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Relative to creating a pilot program to transfer high acuity behavioral health and dual diagnosis patients away from overcrowded emergency departments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4635 |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H993 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H1973 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H1792 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H513 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H391 (Similar To) 2016-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2016
H993 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H1973 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H1792 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H513 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H391 (Similar To) 2016-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1793 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1793.pdf |