MA H1755 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4120
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a commission to study substance use disorder and treatment disparities in minority communities. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To establish a commission to study substance use disorder and treatment disparities in the minority community
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4120 |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H3303 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1223 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2765
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
S718 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2324 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1837 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H1642 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S584 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1455 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H3303 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1223 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2765
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
S718 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2324 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1837 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H1642 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S584 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1455 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1755 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1755.pdf |