DE SB254 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates the Delaware Grocery Initiative.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Food Deserts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2024-06-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-20 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-12 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2024-06-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-06-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-06 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 254, and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |