MA H1624 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing a tax credit for manufacturing employees training. Revenue.
Title
Relative to providing a tax credit for employee training
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D] | Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H32 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H32 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1624 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1624.pdf |