MA H1537 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Messrs. Rogers of Cambridge and Day of Stoneham, a petition of David M. Rogers, Michael S. Day and others establishing a right to counsel in certain eviction cases. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a right to counsel in certain eviction cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2720 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1358 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H2330 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3350 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S850 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4934
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S950 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1555 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3416 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1358 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H2330 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3350 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S850 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4934
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S950 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1555 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3416 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1537 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1537.pdf |