MA H2720 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit members of the General Court from directly or indirectly receiving or requesting compensation from anyone in relation to Committee for Public Counsel Services duties. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to CPCS reimbursement
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Rady Mom [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] |
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Rep. Linda Campbell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2715 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H652 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2330 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S821 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1468 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1555 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H652 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2330 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S821 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1468 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1555 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2720 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2720.pdf |