MA H2330 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the collective bargaining rights for employees of the Committee on Public Counsel Services. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the collective bargaining rights for employees of the Committee for Public Counsel Services

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Moran [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]
Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Joseph Wagner [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Jerald Parisella [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-04-24JointHearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2372 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2385 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2177 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2178 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1511 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1467 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1114 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2188 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2190 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
S2273 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Recommended new text for H3854

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback