MA S2273 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3854
Note: Replaces legislation S2282

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - See H3854
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Similar Bills

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Similar Bills

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #79 (Y: 7 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #78 (Y: 5 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #77 (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #76 (Y: 5 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #75 (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #74 (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateSee H3854
2019-06-27SenateReprinted as amended, see S2282
2019-06-27SenateSubstituted as a new text for H3854
2019-06-27SenateWays and Means amendments adopted, as amended
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #7 (Tarr) adopted
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #6 (Tarr) rejected - see Roll Call #79 [YEAS 7 - NAYS 31]
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #1 (Tran) rejected - see Roll Call #78 [YEAS 5 - NAYS 33]
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #21 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #20 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #19 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #18 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #17 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #16 (Tarr) rejected - see Roll Call #77 [YEAS 6 - NAYS 32]
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #12 (Tarr) rejected - see Roll Call #76 [YEAS 5 - NAYS 33]
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #10 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #9 (Fattman) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #8 (Fattman) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #5 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #4 (Tarr) rejected - see Roll Call #75 [YEAS 6 - NAYS 32]
2019-06-27SenateAmendment #3 (Tarr) rejected - see Roll Call #74 [YEAS 6 - NAYS 32]
2019-06-20SenateRecommended new text for H3854
2019-06-20SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2188 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2190 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H3854 (Replaced by) 2019-08-05 - Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2282 (Replaces) 2019-06-27 - See H3854

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback