MA H3854 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to collective bargaining dues
Title
Relative to collective bargaining dues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - Senate Question on passing , notwithstanding the objections of the Governor Roll Call #92 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House notwithstanding the objection of the Gov Yea and Nay No. 91 (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-31 - House - House On Re-enactment Yea and Nay No. 87 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-25 - Senate - Senate Question on adoption of Amendment recommended by the Governor Roll Call #85 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-07-22 - House - House On adoption of the Governor's amendments Yea and Nay No. 84 (Y: 29 N: 128 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #80 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 70 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #19 Yea and Nay No. 69 (Y: 30 N: 126 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #18 Yea and Nay No. 68 (Y: 27 N: 129 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #10 Yea and Nay No. 67 (Y: 29 N: 127 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #8 Yea and Nay No. 66 (Y: 22 N: 134 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #7 Yea and Nay No. 65 (Y: 28 N: 128 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #6 Yea and Nay No. 64 (Y: 30 N: 126 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #2 Yea and Nay No. 63 (Y: 31 N: 125 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #4 Yea and Nay No. 62 (Y: 31 N: 125 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-18 - House - House notwithstanding the objection of the Gov Yea and Nay No. 91 (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-31 - House - House On Re-enactment Yea and Nay No. 87 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-25 - Senate - Senate Question on adoption of Amendment recommended by the Governor Roll Call #85 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-07-22 - House - House On adoption of the Governor's amendments Yea and Nay No. 84 (Y: 29 N: 128 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #80 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 70 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #19 Yea and Nay No. 69 (Y: 30 N: 126 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #18 Yea and Nay No. 68 (Y: 27 N: 129 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #10 Yea and Nay No. 67 (Y: 29 N: 127 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #8 Yea and Nay No. 66 (Y: 22 N: 134 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #7 Yea and Nay No. 65 (Y: 28 N: 128 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #6 Yea and Nay No. 64 (Y: 30 N: 126 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #2 Yea and Nay No. 63 (Y: 31 N: 125 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - House Amendment #4 Yea and Nay No. 62 (Y: 31 N: 125 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Joint | Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2019 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Passed over veto - see Roll Call #92 [YEAS 39 to NAYS 1] |
2019-09-18 | House | Passed over veto - 156 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 91) |
2019-09-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-08-05 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-08-05 | House | For message, see H4031 |
2019-08-02 | Governor returned to the House with veto | |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Again enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2019-07-31 | House | Re-enacted - 156 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 87) |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Governors amendment rejected -see Roll Call #85 (Yeas 5 to Nays 34) |
2019-07-22 | House | Governors amendment rejected - 29 YEAS to 128 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 84) |
2019-07-22 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2019-07-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2019-07-15 | House | For message, see H3971 |
2019-07-12 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-07-03 | House | Enacted |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-07-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House further amendment |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-07-03 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -- see Roll Call #80 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 1] |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2282 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading and read a third time |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2273 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, June 27, 2019 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2273 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-05 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 70) |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 19 rejected - 30 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 69) |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 18 rejected - 27 YEAS to 129 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 68) |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 10 rejected - 29 YEAS to 127 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 67) |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 9 rejected |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 8 rejected - 22 YEAS to 134 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 66) |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 7 rejected - 28 YEAS to 128 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 65) |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 6 rejected - 30 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 64) |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 3 rejected |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 2 rejected - 31 YEAS to 125 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 63) |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment 4 rejected - 31 YEAS to 125 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 62) |
2019-06-05 | House | Read third |
2019-06-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-05 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-05 | House | Order adopted, see H3855 |
2019-06-05 | House | New draft of H3825 |
2019-06-05 | House | Pending new draft of H3825 |
2019-06-05 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3825 (Replaces) 2019-06-05 - New draft substituted, see H3854
H3855 (Replaced by) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1555 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2273 (Replaced by) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
H3971 (Replaced by) 2019-07-15 - See H3854
H4031 (Replaced by) 2019-08-05 - See H3854
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3855 (Replaced by) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1555 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2273 (Replaced by) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
H3971 (Replaced by) 2019-07-15 - See H3854
H4031 (Replaced by) 2019-08-05 - See H3854
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means