MA H1358 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creditable service in the retirement system for certain reinstated employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the retirement system
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1460 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1454 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1428 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1460 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H18 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H21 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Placed on file
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1460 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1454 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1428 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1460 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H18 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H21 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Placed on file
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1358 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1358.pdf |