MA H1215 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing for appropriations to establish a program of capital improvements to public institutions of higher education to ensure the well being and safety of students, faculty, staff and college communities. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure higher education student and campus safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-04-11JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S762 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H515 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H481 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S759 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H1582 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S235 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S768 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S2248 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback