MA H1161 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5235
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring the fingerprinting of transportation network company drivers. Financial Services.
Title
Requiring the fingerprinting of TNC drivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5235 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2267 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2753
H3523 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
H5235 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2267 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2753
H3523 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
H5235 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1161 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1161.pdf |