MA H1159 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the mission of credit unions and promoting competition among financial institutions. Financial Services.
Title
Enhancing the mission of credit unions and promoting fair competition among financial institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4976 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1219 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
S1183 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
S656 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2974
S1936 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H1108 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1213 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H3818 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
S1183 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
S656 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2974
S1936 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H1108 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1213 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H3818 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1159 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1159.pdf |