MA H1219 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require financial institutions to pay late fees upon failure to conduct electronic transfers. Financial Services.
Title
To require financial institutions to pay late fees when it fails to conduct an electronic transfer
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4976 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1183 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
S1936 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1936 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1219 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1219.pdf |